TN HB0519 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-8)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 62-8)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1083
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, eliminates the professional privilege tax for physicians. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17, relative to taxation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1083 | |
2022-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2022-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/26/2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-23 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/23/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-07 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 5/3/2021 |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2021-03-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 3/10/2021 |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-10 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-04 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0884 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/27/2022