TN SB0884 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-03 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the professional privilege tax for attorneys, physicians, investment advisors, and lobbyists. - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 63 and Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17, relative to taxation.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-03SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-04-29SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2021
2021-04-28SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/28/2021
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021
2021-04-22SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/27/21
2021-03-30SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-03-23SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/30/2021
2021-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/23/2021
2021-02-23SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0519 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback