TN HB0488 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, extends the repeal date by one month for the allocation of a portion of the beer tax and the tax on soft drinks to the highway fund for the purpose of funding programs for the prevention and collection of litter and trash and matters related to the programs, - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to taxes on beverages.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-25 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0506 (Crossfiled) 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee