TN SB0506 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, extends the repeal date by one month for the allocation of a portion of the beer tax and the tax on soft drinks to the highway fund for the purpose of funding programs for the prevention and collection of litter and trash and matters related to the programs, - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 5 and Title 67, Chapter 4, relative to taxes on beverages.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-20SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee
2023-03-14SenateAction deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to first calendar of 2024
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-02-06SenateRefer to Senate F,W&M Revenue Subcommittee`
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0488 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-01 - Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback