TN HB0428 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-04 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs the office of the attorney general to prepare a written statement of a property owner's rights during any condemnation proceeding and to post the statement on its web site; requires that the statement be sent together with any notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 29, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, directs the office of the attorney general to prepare a written statement of a property owner's rights during any condemnation proceeding and to post the statement on its web site; requires that the statement be sent together with any notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 29, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Rep. Rick Womick [R] |
Rep. Jeremy Durham [R] | Rep. Jerry Sexton [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
Rep. Dennis Powers [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Jimmy Matlock [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Judd Matheny [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-26 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-02-18 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0438 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0428&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB0428.pdf |