TN SB0438 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, directs the office of the attorney general to prepare a written statement of a property owner's rights during any condemnation proceeding and to post the statement on its web site; requires that the statement be sent together with any notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 29, Chapter 17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, directs the office of the attorney general to prepare a written statement of a property owner's rights during any condemnation proceeding and to post the statement on its web site; requires that the statement be sent together with any notice of the filing of a petition to institute condemnation proceedings. - Amends TCA Title 29, Chapter 16 and Title 29, Chapter 17.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11SenateWithdrawn.
2015-03-11SenateRecalled from Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2015-02-09SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0428 (Crossfiled) 2015-03-04 - Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback