TN HB0370 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-04 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates a committee to determine when and how quarantine and disease communication tracking procedures should be implemented; removes quarantine authority from health commissioner and county health officer; requires county health departments to publish data regarding epidemic testing. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4 and Title 68, relative to quarantine procedures.
Sponsors
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Dale Carr [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 75 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-05-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 75, Nays 13, PNV 2 |
2021-05-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0409) |
2021-05-03 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0361) |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-28 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-06 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/6/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee-- Government Operations for Review |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0221 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-14 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0