TN HB0350 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the Tennessee public utilities commission to keep electronic copies of minutes and official documents. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 28; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 69.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 28; Title 64; Title 65; Title 67; Title 68 and Title 69, relative to utilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-21 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0295 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee