TN HB0319 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 349
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, extends the consumer advocate division in the office of the attorney general and reporter to June 30, 2022. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 65, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 65, Chapter 4, relative to the consumer advocate division in the office of the attorney general and reporter.
Sponsors
Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] | Rep. Chris Todd [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 349 | |
2021-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-29 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-08 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Government Operations Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on cal. Government Operations Committee for 3/8/2021 |
2021-02-10 | House | P2C, ref. to Government Operations Committee |
2021-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0046 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 06/30/2021