TN HB0279 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-26 - Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows certain persons deprived of the right of suffrage to apply for a voter registration card and have the right of suffrage provisionally restored if the person enters into a payment plan to become current on all child support obligations. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 29.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 29, relative to voting rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-26 | House | Failed in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-19 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/26/2024 |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-02-06 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Criminal Justice Committee |
2024-01-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2024-01-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 1/16/2024 |
2023-04-04 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 4/4/2023 |
2023-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2023 |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2023-01-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-01-20 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-19 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0904 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-04 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 1/23/2024