TN HB0174 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, creates a list of rights and protections afforded to educators. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As enacted, creates a list of rights and protections afforded to educators. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Reedy [R] | Rep. Tim Rudd [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] |
Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. John Ragan [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Pub. Ch. 360 | |
2017-05-22 | Effective date(s) 05/11/2017 | |
2017-05-11 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-05-09 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0375) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0282) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0281) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-05-02 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-05-01 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 88, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-05-01 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0485) |
2017-05-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-01 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0178) |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Action def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-29 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-02-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-01-30 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0014 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360