TN SB0014 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a list of rights and protections afforded to educators. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a list of rights and protections afforded to educators. - Amends TCA Title 49.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 360
2017-05-04SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-04SenateCompanion House Bill substituted
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-03SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 5/4/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-04-27SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-04SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 1 PNV 1
2017-03-29SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017
2017-03-29SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017
2017-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017
2017-01-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-01-30SenateRefer to Senate Education Committee
2017-01-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, held on desk pending committee appointments
2017-01-10SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-01-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0174 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 360

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback