TN HB0163 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the authority to order an autopsy from the county medical examiner; authorizes the district attorney general to order an autopsy in certain circumstances; authorizes the chief medical examiner to order an autopsy if the district attorney general fails to act. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, removes the authority to order an autopsy from the county medical examiner; authorizes the district attorney general to order an autopsy in certain circumstances; authorizes the chief medical examiner to order an autopsy if the district attorney general fails to act. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 2/20/2019 |
2019-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee |
2019-01-31 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-01-28 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1202 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee