TN SB1202 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, removes the authority to order an autopsy from the county medical examiner; authorizes the district attorney general to order an autopsy in certain circumstances; authorizes the chief medical examiner to order an autopsy if the district attorney general fails to act. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, removes the authority to order an autopsy from the county medical examiner; authorizes the district attorney general to order an autopsy in certain circumstances; authorizes the chief medical examiner to order an autopsy if the district attorney general fails to act. - Amends TCA Title 38, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0163 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-20 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Health Subcommittee of Health Committee