TN HB0039 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-12)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Jim Coley Protection for Rape Survivors Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 10-7-504; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 63.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Section 10-7-504; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 63, relative to sexual offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362 | |
2021-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2021 |
2021-02-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-01-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2020-12-14 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1035 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2021; 07/01/2021