TN SB1035 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Pub. Ch. 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Jim Coley Protection for Rape Survivors Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Section 10-7-504; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Section 10-7-504; Title 29; Title 38; Title 39; Title 40 and Title 63, relative to sexual offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18 Pub. Ch. 362
2021-05-18 Effective date(s) 05/11/2021; 07/01/2021
2021-05-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-05-04SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-05-04HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-30SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-28SenateConcurred, Ayes 31, Nays 0 (Amendment 1 - HA0198)
2021-04-27SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar for 4/28/2021
2021-04-27HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-27HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0198)
2021-04-27HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2021-04-14HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2021-04-12SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-12SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2021-04-12SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0181)
2021-04-08SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021
2021-03-30SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2021-03-24SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/30/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0039 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 362

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback