TN HB0036 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands authorization for $25.00 litigation tax on criminal cases in Fentress County to support physically and sexually abused children to authorization of a litigation tax of up to $25.00 in any county in the state on civil and criminal cases to support child advocacy centers and child protective teams serving the county. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-601.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-4-601, relative to litigation taxes in support of services benefiting children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-23 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-16 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2021-02-10 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 2/16/2021 |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2021-01-13 | House | Ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-01-13 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2021-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2020-12-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0213 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee