TN SB0213 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands authorization for $25.00 litigation tax on criminal cases in Fentress County to support physically and sexually abused children to authorization of a litigation tax of up to $25.00 in any county in the state on civil and criminal cases to support child advocacy centers and child protective teams serving the county. - Amends TCA Section 67-4-601.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 67-4-601, relative to litigation taxes in support of services benefiting children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/23/2021 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/23/21 |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/23/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/16/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0036 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee