SD SB117 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-02 - Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 176
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase dollar limits related to play on video lottery machines.
Title
Increase dollar limits related to play on video lottery machines.
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Maher [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Reconsidered (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-01 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-01-31 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | Senate | Senate Reconsidered, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 176 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Intent to reconsider S.J. 165 |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Failed, YEAS 17, NAYS 18. S.J. 165 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Commerce and Energy Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 3. S.J. 10 |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Commerce and Energy S.J. 112 |