SD HB1200 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Require the posting of contact information for persons serving on a board of township supervisors.
Title
Require the posting of contact information for persons serving on a board of township supervisors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Do Pass Amended (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Local Government Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 49 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Local Government Do Pass Amended (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 5, 2019 H.J. 650 |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 04, 2019 H.J. 596 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 556 |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 579 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 31, NAYS 1. S.J. 522 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 498 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-02-12 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 351 |
2019-02-11 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 49, NAYS 18. H.J. 362 |
2019-02-07 | House | Local Government Title amended, Passed H.J. 320 Amendment 1200cta |
2019-02-07 | House | Local Government Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 5. |
2019-02-07 | House | Local Government Hoghoused, Passed Amendment 1200ca |
2019-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2019-01-30 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 253 |