SD HB1188 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 H.J. 858
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 H.J. 858
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Exempt certain operations of school buses from commercial motor vehicle fees.
Title
Exempt certain operations of school buses from commercial motor vehicle fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate Transportation Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House Transportation Do Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on March 9, 2016 H.J. 858 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor on March 08, 2016 H.J. 845 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 555 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 767 |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 489 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 0. S.J. 466 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-11 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Transportation S.J. 293 |
2016-02-10 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 1. H.J. 361 |
2016-02-09 | House | Placed on consent, Passed |
2016-02-09 | House | Transportation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 12, NAYS 0. H.J. 337 |
2016-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2016-02-03 | House | First read in House and referred to House Transportation H.J. 255 |