SD HB1168 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-21 - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 437
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding nonresident waterfowl licenses.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding nonresident waterfowl licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 24 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House of Representatives Motion to amend (Y: 36 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Failed, YEAS 24, NAYS 44. H.J. 437 |
2017-02-21 | House | House of Representatives Motion to amend, Passed, YEAS 36, NAYS 32. H.J. 436 Amendment 1168jd |
2017-02-16 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 421 |
2017-02-15 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 410 |
2017-02-14 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 393 |
2017-02-13 | House | House of Representatives Deferred to another day, Passed H.J. 378 |
2017-02-09 | House | Agriculture and Natural Resources Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 5. H.J. 357 |
2017-02-09 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2017-02-01 | House | First read in House and referred to House Agriculture and Natural Resources H.J. 251 |