SD HB1147 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-07 - Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 497
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for the organization of townships or fractions of townships.
Title
Provide for the organization of townships or fractions of townships.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Do Pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - House - Do Pass (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - Do Pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-07 | House | Signed by the Governor on March 07, 2023 H.J. 497 |
2023-03-01 | House | Delivered to the Governor on March 01, 2023 H.J. 420 |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Signed by the President S.J. 361 |
2023-02-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker H.J. 374 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 35, NAYS 0. S.J. 329 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Certified uncontested, placed on consent S.J. 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 6, NAYS 0. S.J. 13 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing S.J. 1 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Local Government S.J. 235 |
2023-02-08 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 68, NAYS 0. H.J. 261 |
2023-02-07 | House | Certified uncontested, placed on consent |
2023-02-07 | House | Local Government Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 13, NAYS 0. |
2023-02-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2023-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Local Government H.J. 159 |