SD HB1137 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Signed by Governor H.J. 716
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Exclude the passing time between classes in the number of hours required in the school term for secondary students.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exclude the passing time between classes in the number of hours required in the school term for secondary students.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Education Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Education Do Pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-11SenateSigned by Governor H.J. 716
2015-03-05SenateDelivered to the Governor H.J. 621
2015-03-04SenateSigned by President S.J. 590
2015-03-03SenateSigned by Speaker H.J. 581
2015-02-27SenateSenate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 32, NAYS 0. S.J. 551
2015-02-26SenatePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-26SenateEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 5, NAYS 0. S.J. 525
2015-02-26SenateScheduled for hearing
2015-02-10SenateFirst read in Senate and referred to Senate Education S.J. 356
2015-02-09HouseHouse of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 67, NAYS 0. H.J. 342
2015-02-06HousePlaced on consent, Passed
2015-02-06HouseEducation Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 14, NAYS 0. H.J. 320
2015-02-06HouseScheduled for hearing
2015-01-28HouseFirst read in House and referred to House Education H.J. 199

Subjects


South Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback