SD HB1092 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-03 - Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 557
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establish the rural school teacher recruitment assistance program, and to make an appropriation to the education enhancement trust fund to provide for the annual funding of the program.
Title
Establish the rural school teacher recruitment assistance program, and to make an appropriation to the education enhancement trust fund to provide for the annual funding of the program.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Holmes [R] | Rep. Fred Deutsch [R] | Rep. Patrick Kirschman [D] | Rep. Tona Rozum [R] |
Sen. John Wiik [R] | Rep. Mark Willadsen [R] | Sen. Larry Zikmund [R] | Sen. Brock Greenfield [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Tabled (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass Amended (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass Amended (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Appropriations Tabled, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. S.J. 557 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-05 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 303 |
2015-02-04 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 65, NAYS 4. H.J. 297 |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Do Pass Amended, Passed, YEAS 7, NAYS 1. H.J. 241 |
2015-01-30 | House | Appropriations Motion to amend, Passed Amendment 1092na |
2015-01-30 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-26 | House | First read in House and referred to House Appropriations H.J. 157 |