SD HB1048 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor H.J. 738
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revise certain provisions regarding state hosting and employee reimbursement policies.
Title
Revise certain provisions regarding state hosting and employee reimbursement policies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate Do Pass (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House of Representatives Do Pass (Y: 57 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - House Appropriations Do Pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor H.J. 738 |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Delivered to the Governor H.J. 644 |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President S.J. 613 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Signed by Speaker H.J. 601 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Senate Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 33, NAYS 1. S.J. 566 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 8, NAYS 1. S.J. 544 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-02-10 | Senate | First read in Senate and referred to Senate Appropriations S.J. 355 |
2015-02-09 | House | House of Representatives Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 57, NAYS 10. H.J. 352 |
2015-02-06 | House | Appropriations Do Pass, Passed, YEAS 9, NAYS 0. H.J. 321 |
2015-02-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred to House Appropriations H.J. 39 |
2015-01-13 | House | First read in House H.J. 31 |