SC S1109 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-03 - Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulate The Rbc Heritage Presented By Boeing Golf Tournament Held Each Year On Hilton Head Island On The Occasion Of Its Fiftieth Anniversary This Coming April And To Recognize And Thank The Heritage Classic Foundation, The Tournament Sponsors, And Countless Friends And Volunteers Who Have Made This Special Event So Successful And Unique Among Pga Tour Events.
Title
RBC Heritage Golf Tournament
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate with concurrence |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced, adopted, sent to House |