SC S1030 | 2009-2010 | 118th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 240
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on July 6 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-06 - Act No. 240
Summary
AN ACT TO AMEND THE CODE OF LAWS OF SOUTH CAROLINA, 1976, BY ADDING SECTION 1-1-714 SO AS TO DESIGNATE THE MARSH TACKY AS THE OFFICIAL STATE HERITAGE HORSE OF SOUTH CAROLINA, AND BY ADDING SECTION 1-1-714A SO AS TO DESIGNATE THE MULE AS THE OFFICIAL STATE HERITAGE WORK ANIMAL OF SOUTH CAROLINA. - ratified title
Title
Designate The Mule As The Official State Heritage Work Animal Of South Carolina. - Ratified Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-06 | Act No. 240 | |
2010-06-28 | Effective date 06/11/10 | |
2010-06-11 | Signed By Governor | |
2010-06-07 | Ratified R 307 | |
2010-06-01 | Roll call Yeas-62 Nays-31 HJ-79 | |
2010-06-01 | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled HJ-79 | |
2010-05-25 | Debate adjourned until Tuesday, June 1, 2010 HJ-110 | |
2010-05-19 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2010-05-18 | Returned to House with amendments SJ-24 | |
2010-05-18 | House amendment amended SJ-24 | |
2010-05-12 | Read third time and returned to Senate with amendments HJ-20 | |
2010-05-11 | Read second time HJ-16 | |
2010-05-11 | Amended HJ-16 | |
2010-05-06 | Debate adjourned HJ-48 | |
2010-05-06 | Debate interrupted HJ-28 | |
2010-04-29 | Debate adjourned HJ-38 | |
2010-04-28 | Committee report: Favorable Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-9 | |
2010-04-20 | Referred to Committee on Invitations and Memorial Resolutions HJ-46 | |
2010-04-20 | Introduced and read first time HJ-46 | |
2010-04-20 | Read third time and sent to House SJ-10 | |
2010-04-15 | Read second time SJ-18 | |
2010-04-15 | Committee Amendment Adopted SJ-18 | |
2010-04-14 | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary SJ-60 | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to Subcommittee: Campbell (ch), Knotts, Campsen, Lourie | |
2010-01-12 | Referred to Committee on Judiciary SJ-61 | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced and read first time SJ-61 |
Same As/Similar To
H3044 (Similar To) 2010-02-25 - Debate adjourned until Thursday, March 4, 2010
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/cgi-bin/web_bh10.exe?bill1=1030&session=118 |