SC S0999 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Operations and Management
Pending: Senate Operations and Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Recommitted to Committee on Operations and Management
Pending: Senate Operations and Management Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Fix Noon On Wednesday, February 5, 2020, As The Time To Elect A Successor To A Certain Justice Of The Supreme Court, Seat 5, Whose Term Will Expire July 31, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Seat 7, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At Large, Seat 11, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Circuit Court, At Large, Seat 13, Upon His Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2020, And The Successor Will Fill A New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2026; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Third Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2020, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2025; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifth Judicial Circuit, Seat 1, Upon Her Retirement On November 30, 2018, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire On June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Sixth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Ninth Judicial Circuit, Seat 5, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020, And The Successor Will Fill The New Term Of That Office Which Will Expire On June 30, 2026; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Tenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Upon His Retirement On Or Before June 30, 2019, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire On June 30, 2025; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Thirteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 5, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fourteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 2, Upon His Retirement On Or Before December 31, 2019, And The Successor Will Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire On June 30, 2022; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, Fifteenth Judicial Circuit, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, At Large, Seat 1, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2025; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Family Court, At Large, Seat 2, To Fill The Unexpired Term Of That Office Which Will Expire June 30, 2025; To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 3, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020; And To Elect A Successor To A Certain Judge Of The Administrative Law Court, Seat 4, Whose Term Will Expire On June 30, 2020.
Title
Elections on February 5, 2020
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee on Operations and Management |
2020-01-17 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable Operations and Management |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Polled out of committee Operations and Management |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Operations and Management |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
Same As/Similar To
H4934 (Similar To) 2020-01-16 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence