SC H5383 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-09 - Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provide That Pursuant To Section 9, Article Iii, Of The Constitution Of This State, 1895, When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, May 10, 2018, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Or Anytime Earlier, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet In Statewide Session At 12:00 Noon On Wednesday, May 23, 2018, And Continue In Statewide Session, If Necessary, Until Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Thursday, May 24, 2018, For The Consideration Of Certain Specified Matters, To Provide That When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn On Thursday, May 24, 2018, Not Later Than 5:00 P.m., Or Anytime Earlier, Each House Shall Stand Adjourned To Meet In Statewide Session At 12:00 Noon On Wednesday, June 13, 2018, And To Continue In Statewide Session, If Necessary, Until Not Later Than 5:00 P.m. On Friday, June 15, 2018, And To Provide That When The Respective Houses Of The General Assembly Adjourn Not Later Not Later Than 11:59 P.m., Sunday, November 11, 2018, The General Assembly Shall Stand Adjourned Sine Die.
Title
Sine Die Adjournment
Sponsors
Rep. James Lucas [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 105 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Adoption Of Concurrent Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - House - House: Adoption Of Concurrent Resolution (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | House | Roll call Yeas-105 Nays-0 |
2018-05-09 | House | Concurred in amendment |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Returned to House with amendments |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Amended |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-05-08 | House | Adopted, sent to Senate |
2018-05-08 | House | Roll call Yeas-110 Nays-0 |
2018-05-08 | House | Introduced |