SC H5242 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 79-44)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Declare Wednesday, May 2, 2018, "south Carolina Teen Pregnancy Prevention Day" And To Honor The Valuable Contributions Of The South Carolina Campaign To Prevent Teen Pregnancy, Its Partners Within Local Communities And Organizations, Parents, Educators, And Trusted Adults.
Title
SC Teen Pregnancy Prevention Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2018-04-25 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Polled out of committee General |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-04-17 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |