SC H5100 | 2015-2016 | 121st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Act No. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-23 - Act No. 172
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exclude Application Of The Article To Certain Insurance Policies
Title
Emergency Medical Care Act
Sponsors
Rep. Russell Fry [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-26 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-23 | Act No. 172 | |
2016-05-18 | Effective date 05/12/16 | |
2016-05-12 | Signed By Governor | |
2016-05-11 | Ratified R 183 | |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and enrolled |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Recalled from Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Medical Affairs |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2016-04-15 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Unanimous consent for third reading on next legislative day |
2016-04-14 | House | Roll call Yeas-97 Nays-0 |
2016-04-14 | House | Read second time |
2016-04-13 | House | Committee report: Favorable Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2016-03-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2016-03-15 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 71 | 1520 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
38 | 71 | 1545 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |