SC H4408 | 2013-2014 | 120th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-10 - Act No. 203
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Add Three Members To The Committee, To Change Quorum Requirements, And To Make Technical Corrections
Title
Child Fatality Advisory Committee
Sponsors
Rep. Jenny Horne [R] | Rep. David Weeks [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-28 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-22 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-10 | Act No. 203 | |
2014-06-06 | Effective date 06/02/14 | |
2014-06-02 | Signed By Governor | |
2014-05-29 | Ratified R 256 | |
2014-05-28 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2014-05-23 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-39 Nays-0 |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Read second time |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2014-05-22 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2014-03-27 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2014-03-26 | House | Roll call Yeas-102 Nays-0 |
2014-03-26 | House | Read second time |
2014-03-26 | House | Amended |
2014-03-24 | Scrivener's error corrected | |
2014-03-20 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Judiciary |
2014-03-19 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Weeks |
2014-01-14 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2014-01-14 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2013-12-10 | House | Prefiled |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 11 | 1930 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
63 | 11 | 1940 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |