SC H4327 | 2019-2020 | 123rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Act No. 157
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The Code Of Laws Of South Carolina, 1976, By Adding Section 6-9-67 So As To Provide That Structures Without A Commercial Kitchen Used In Agritourism Activity As Defined By Section 46-53-10 Shall Fall Under The Group A-3 Classification, As Defined In The Latest Edition Of The Applicable Building Codes Pursuant To Section 6-9-50, And That These Structures May Accommodate Up To Three Hundred Guests Without Installing A Sprinkler System. - Ratified Title
Title
Building Codes
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Williams [D] | Rep. Joseph Jefferson [D] | Rep. Russell Ott [D] | Rep. Josiah Magnuson [R] |
Rep. William Chumley [R] | Rep. James Burns [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-09-22 - House - House: Concur In Senate Amendments (Y: 106 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-09-15 - Senate - Senate: 2nd Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House: Passage Of Bill (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Act No. 157 | |
2020-10-02 | Effective date 09/28/20 | |
2020-09-28 | Signed By Governor | |
2020-09-25 | Ratified R 179 | |
2020-09-22 | House | Roll call Yeas-106 Nays-0 |
2020-09-22 | House | Concurred in Senate amendment and enrolled |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Read third time and returned to House with amendments |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Roll call Ayes-40 Nays-0 |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2020-09-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment Adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Introduced and read first time |
2019-05-07 | House | Read third time and sent to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | Roll call Yeas-98 Nays-0 |
2019-05-02 | House | Read second time |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended |
2019-04-30 | House | Committee report: Favorable with amendment Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-27 | House | Referred to Committee on Labor, Commerce and Industry |
2019-03-27 | House | Introduced and read first time |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
46 | 53 | 10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 9 | 50 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
6 | 9 | 67 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |