SC H4074 | 2017-2018 | 122nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 77-43)
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Adopted, returned to House with concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Memorialize The United States Congress And Urge Them To Pass H.r. 2747, The "atomic Veterans Service Medal Act".
Title
Atomic Veterans Service Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Senate | Adopted, returned to House with concurrence |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Committee report: Favorable General |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-30 | House | Introduced, adopted, sent to Senate |