SC H3567 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 9-16-57 So As To Provide That The Retirement Investment Commission May Not Invest Public Employee Retirement Funds In Certain Companies Owned, In Whole Or In Part, By The People's Republic Of China Or The Chinese Communist Party.
Title
Public employee retirement fund investments
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell |
2023-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Landing |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-15 | House | Referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2022-12-15 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0163 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3118 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3509 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3510 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3118 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3509 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3510 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
Code Citations
South Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/billsearch.php?billnumbers=3567&session=125&summary=B |
Text | https://www.scstatehouse.gov/sess125_2023-2024/prever/3567_20221215.htm |