SC H3118 | 2023-2024 | 125th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
Pending: House Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amend The South Carolina Code Of Laws By Adding Section 27-1-80 So As To Provide That Certain Companies Owned, In Whole Or In Part, By The People's Republic Of China Or The Chinese Communist Party May Not Own, Lease, Possess, Or Exercise Any Control Over Any Land Or Real Estate Located Within Fifty Miles Of A State Or Federal Military Base Or Installation For The Purpose Of Installing Or Erecting Certain Towers.
Title
Chinese Land Ownership Prohibition
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Gilliam [R] | Rep. John Mccravy [R] | Rep. Bill Taylor [R] | Rep. Thomas Pope [R] |
Rep. Rob Harris [R] | Rep. David O'Neal [R] | Rep. Kathy Landing [R] | Rep. Richard Yow [R] |
Rep. Cody Mitchell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell |
2023-02-01 | House | Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Landing |
2023-01-10 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and read first time |
2022-12-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Medical, Military, Public and Municipal Affairs |
2022-12-08 | House | Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
S0163 (Similar To) 2023-02-08 - Scrivener's error corrected
H3509 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3510 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3567 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3509 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3510 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell
H3567 (Similar To) 2023-03-01 - Member(s) request name added as sponsor: Yow, Mitchell