RI S3067 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - Meeting postponed (06/04/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 9 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - Meeting postponed (06/04/2024)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- PROPERTY SUBJECT TO TAXATION - Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of the Providence Preservation Society.
Title
Exempts from taxation the real and tangible personal property of the Providence Preservation Society.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/04/2024) |
2024-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Committee continued |
2024-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/30/2024) |
2024-05-09 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S3067.pdf |