RI S3057 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-05 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Title
Joint Resolution Making An Appropriation To Pay Certain Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-05 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-19 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2014) |
2014-06-16 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/16/2014) |
2014-06-12 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-12 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2014) |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/10/2014) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |