RI S2963 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS - Provides state employee public safety professionals with parity to municipal public safety employees in the state/municipal retirement systems eff. 7/1/24 with 10% contribution.
Title
Provides state employee public safety professionals with parity to municipal public safety employees in the state/municipal retirement systems eff. 7/1/24 with 10% contribution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/09/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- RETIREMENT SYSTEM CONTRIBUTIONS AND BENEFITS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2963.pdf |