RI S2953 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISH AND WILDLIFE -- COMMERCIAL FISHERIES - Creates commercial dock space for businesses subject to being reviewed by the DEM. Would also include commercial fishers to be eligible for a grant program.
Title
Creates commercial dock space for businesses subject to being reviewed by the DEM. Would also include commercial fishers to be eligible for a grant program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/08/2024) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2953.pdf |