RI S2854 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-26 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
TAXATION -- MOTOR VEHICLE AND TRAILER EXCISE TAX ELIMINATION ACT OF 1998 - Repeals the provision setting a different timeline for reimbursement of East Providence for the FY 2025, and would bring East Providence in line with other municipalities in the timing of reimbursements.
Title
Repeals the provision setting a different timeline for reimbursement of East Providence for the FY 2025, and would bring East Providence in line with other municipalities in the timing of reimbursements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-13 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-12 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-26 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2024-06-13 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2024-06-12 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/13/2024) |
2024-06-12 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/12/2024) |
2024-06-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-06-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/10/2024) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/04/2024) |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |