RI S2736 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Referred to House Corporations
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC UTILITIES AND CARRIERS -- OPERATION OF RAILROADS GENERALLY - Provides that no train or light engine would be used in connection with the movement of freight could be operated unless it had a crew consisting of at least 2 persons, would also include the imposition of fines upon a company for violation of the act.
Title
Provides that no train or light engine would be used in connection with the movement of freight could be operated unless it had a crew consisting of at least 2 persons, would also include the imposition of fines upon a company for violation of the act.
Sponsors
Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. John Burke [D] | Sen. David Tikoian [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-07 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Passage (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Committee on Commerce: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/07/2024) |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-26 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/30/2024) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |