RI S2657 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Meeting postponed (04/05/2022)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-05 - Meeting postponed (04/05/2022)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires court to release defendant who is violator of probation on personal recognizance unless reasonable surety is required or unless a crime of violence under § 11-47-2(5) or a crime of domestic violence under § 12-29-2.
Title
Relating Criminal Procedure -- Sentence And Execution
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Meeting postponed (04/05/2022) |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2657.pdf |