RI S2656 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the director of the department of corrections shall establish a program to provide access to electronic multimedia tablets to prisoners in the general population. The program administered at no cost to the department.
Title
Corrections Department
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/26/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2656.pdf |