RI S2639 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires family court and/or DCYF to provide child who is subject of a DCYF neglect or abuse petition or termination of parental rights or an adoption based on parental neglect or abuse, a mental health referral based on the individual needs of the child.
Title
Adoption Of Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/07/2022) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/SenateText22/S2639.pdf |