RI S2601 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Subjects obligors of child support to license suspension after a 60-day arrearage but provides conditional driving privileges for employment.
Title
Full Enforcement Of Support Obligations
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Jeanine Calkin [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Crowley [D] | Sen. Harold Metts [D] |
Sen. Paul Jabour [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/12/2018) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2601.pdf |