RI S2542 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Permits payments to parents who serve as certified nursing assistant caregiver for their children.
Title
Medical Assistance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/27/2018) |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/13/2018) |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2542.pdf |