RI S2534 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Environment and Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
WATERS AND NAVIGATION -- COASTAL RESOURCES MANAGEMENT COUNCIL - Requires that the appointment of public members to the coastal resources management council to include an active, licensed fisher, a representative from Save the Bay and from an organization representing developers.
Title
Requires that the appointment of public members to the coastal resources management council to include an active, licensed fisher, a representative from Save the Bay and from an organization representing developers.
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Victoria Gu [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] |
Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/03/2024) |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2534.pdf |