RI S2471 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
This act eliminates unnecessary language regarding supplementary assistance and increases access to assisted living services for Medicaid beneficiaries.
Title
Public Assistance Act
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Christopher Ottiano [R] | Sen. David Bates [R] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/11/2014) |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2014) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |